LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB248
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB248
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB248
Compare Versions
SB248 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB248 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB248 Enrolled May 27, 2017
SB248 Comm Sub May 20, 2017
SB248 Engrossed April 3, 2017
SB248 Comm Sub March 22, 2017
SB248 Introduced November 21, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB248 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB248 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB248 Enrolled May 27, 2017
SB248 Comm Sub May 20, 2017
SB248 Engrossed April 3, 2017
SB248 Comm Sub March 22, 2017
SB248 Introduced November 21, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare