House | 05/09/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3156 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 616 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 629 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 562 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 562 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 561 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 436 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 235 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 92 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 92 | |
Senate | 11/21/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/21/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |