Senate | 03/22/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 128 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 128 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 121 | |
Senate | 01/23/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 84 | |
Senate | 11/21/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/21/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |