E | 05/18/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/18/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2113 | |
E | 05/08/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1732 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3022 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1722 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1732 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1682 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2525 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#737 | Journal Page: 2524 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2524 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2524 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2372 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2372 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 1755 | Journal Page: 2372 |
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2299 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 939 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 129 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 129 | |
Senate | 11/29/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/29/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |