Senate | 03/21/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 629 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 362 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 341 | |
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 235 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 01/23/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 84 | |
Senate | 12/06/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/06/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |