Senate | 05/16/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 12/08/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/08/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |