E
|
05/26/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
E
|
05/18/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3742
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3499
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1268
|
Journal Page: 3499
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3499
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3498
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3465
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3465
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Referred to Texas Ports, Innovation & Infrastructure, Select
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1507
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 860
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Creighton
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 831
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 545
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|