Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB289 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 289
2- (In the Senate - Filed December 12, 2016; January 30, 2017,
3- read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4- April 5, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
5- Nays 1; April 5, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
2+ Creighton
73
84
95 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
106 AN ACT
117 relating to the preparation of government growth impact statements
128 for rules proposed by state agencies.
139 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1410 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 2001, Government Code, is
1511 amended by adding Section 2001.0221 to read as follows:
1612 Sec. 2001.0221. GOVERNMENT GROWTH IMPACT STATEMENTS.
1713 (a) A state agency shall prepare a government growth impact
1814 statement for a proposed rule.
1915 (b) A state agency shall reasonably describe in the
2016 government growth impact statement whether, during the first five
2117 years that the rule will be in effect:
2218 (1) the rule creates or eliminates a government
2319 program;
2420 (2) implementation of the rule requires the creation
2521 of new employee positions or the elimination of existing employee
2622 positions;
2723 (3) implementation of the rule requires an increase or
2824 decrease in future legislative appropriations to the agency;
2925 (4) the rule requires an increase or decrease in fees
3026 paid to the agency;
3127 (5) the rule creates a new regulation;
3228 (6) the rule expands, limits, or repeals an existing
3329 regulation;
3430 (7) the rule increases or decreases the number of
3531 individuals subject to the rule's applicability; and
3632 (8) the rule positively or adversely affects the
3733 state's economy.
3834 (c) The comptroller shall adopt rules to implement this
3935 section. The rules must require that the government growth impact
4036 statement be in plain language. The comptroller may prescribe the
4137 use of a chart that a state agency may use to disclose the items
4238 required under Subsection (b).
4339 (d) Each state agency shall incorporate the impact
4440 statement into the notice required by Section 2001.024.
4541 (e) This section applies to the adoption of an emergency
4642 rule.
4743 (f) Failure to comply with this section does not impair the
4844 legal effect of a rule adopted under this chapter.
4945 SECTION 2. Not later than October 1, 2017, the comptroller
5046 of public accounts shall adopt rules under Section 2001.0221(c),
5147 Government Code, as added by this Act.
5248 SECTION 3. Section 2001.0221, Government Code, as added by
5349 this Act, applies only to a proposed rule for which the notice
5450 required under Section 2001.023(b), Government Code, is filed on or
5551 after November 1, 2017.
5652 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
57- * * * * *