House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 03/23/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 436 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 334 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 334 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |