LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB291
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB291
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB291
Compare Versions
SB291 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB291 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB291 Enrolled May 23, 2017
SB291 Comm Sub May 5, 2017
SB291 Engrossed April 5, 2017
SB291 Comm Sub March 29, 2017
SB291 Introduced December 13, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB291 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB291 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB291 Enrolled May 23, 2017
SB291 Comm Sub May 5, 2017
SB291 Engrossed April 5, 2017
SB291 Comm Sub March 29, 2017
SB291 Introduced December 13, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare