E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6036
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4139
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4139
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1950
|
Journal Page: 5644
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5644
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3645
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees with instructions
|
|
Journal Page: 5505
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Motion prevails
|
|
Journal Page: 5505
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Motion to instruct conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5505
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5504
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3211
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3211
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3211
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3211
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3208
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3502
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1271
|
Journal Page: 3501
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3501
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3501
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3478
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3478
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
10-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 3478
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3478
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1262
|
Journal Page: 3477
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
11-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 3477
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
10-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 3476
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
|
9-Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 3475
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
|
Journal Page: 3475
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
9-Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 3475
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Amended
|
1-S. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 3470
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3470
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1473
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1473
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1109
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 871
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 871
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 871
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 871
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 871
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 871
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 871
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 871
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Hughes
|
Journal Page: 870
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 870
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 870
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 334
|
Senate
|
02/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 334
|
Senate
|
02/24/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|