LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB304
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB304
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB304
Compare Versions
SB304 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB304 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB304 Enrolled May 23, 2017
SB304 Comm Sub May 11, 2017
SB304 Engrossed April 5, 2017
SB304 Comm Sub March 30, 2017
SB304 Introduced March 1, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB304 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB304 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB304 Enrolled May 23, 2017
SB304 Comm Sub May 11, 2017
SB304 Engrossed April 5, 2017
SB304 Comm Sub March 30, 2017
SB304 Introduced March 1, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare