Senate | 03/22/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 528 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 437 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 92 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 92 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |