E
|
06/09/2017
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6060
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 58
|
Journal Page: 6054
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 58
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 3805
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3805
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3805
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5676
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5676
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4775
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4775
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4362
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4362
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4362
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2205
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2204
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2204
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2204
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3619
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1296
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 6(g)
|
Journal Page: 3617
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Uresti
|
Journal Page: 3617
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3617
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3571
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Amended
|
49-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 3569
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3569
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1286
|
Journal Page: 3568
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
48-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 3568
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
47-Walle
|
Journal Page: 3567
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Motion to reconsider fails
|
|
Journal Page: 3566
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
46-Neave
|
Journal Page: 3566
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
39-Minjarez
|
Journal Page: 3562
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
40-E. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 3561
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
32-Shaheen
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Amendment as amended fails of adoption
|
10-Pickett
|
Journal Page: 3525
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3516
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3156
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1473
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1473
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 615
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 615
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 629
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 548
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 437
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 405
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 405
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|