House
|
05/21/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4175
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2124
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2124
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1489
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1146
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
FA5 Buckingham
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA6 Perry
|
Journal Page: 1000
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA5 Buckingham
|
Journal Page: 1000
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1000
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Amended
|
FA2 Burton
|
Journal Page: 999
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Motion to table fails
|
|
Journal Page: 999
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 998
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 860
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 456
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 456
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|