House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1086 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 714 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 629 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 576 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 363 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 175 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 133 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 133 | |
Senate | 12/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |