House | 04/13/2017 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Rodrguez | Journal Page: 732 |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 690 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | Journal Page: 690 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 714 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 133 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 133 | |
Senate | 12/15/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/15/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |