E | 05/22/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/22/2017 | Filed without the Governor's signature | Journal Page: 2574 | |
E | 05/11/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1904 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3385 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1876 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1904 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1790 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3065 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1049 | Journal Page: 3065 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3065 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3065 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3046 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3046 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3731 | Journal Page: 3046 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3156 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1489 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1146 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 992 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 992 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 992 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 991 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 991 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 991 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 991 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 134 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 134 | |
Senate | 12/16/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/16/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |