House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3890 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3153 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1828 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1744 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1744 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1744 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1744 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1744 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 1744 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Garcia | Journal Page: 1743 |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1743 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1743 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1743 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1318 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 12/16/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/16/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |