Senate | 03/20/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 574 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 415 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 341 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 191 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 169 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 169 | |
Senate | 12/20/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/20/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |