House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2508 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1732 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1629 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1629 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1629 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1629 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1629 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1629 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1629 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1532 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1321 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 169 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 169 | |
Senate | 12/20/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/20/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |