E | 06/09/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 06/09/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4244 | |
E | 05/28/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4213 | |
House | 05/28/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6032 | |
Senate | 05/27/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3794 | |
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3699 | |
Senate | 05/25/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | RV#1814 | Journal Page: 4806 |
House | 05/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 4806 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4806 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4781 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4781 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3746 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3018 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3018 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 699 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 494 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 494 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 494 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 494 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 494 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 494 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 494 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 93 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 93 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |