Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB408 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson, et al. S.B. No. 408
 (In the Senate - Filed January 3, 2017; February 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 March 20, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; March 20, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 408 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of a governmental body for the purposes
 of the public information law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 552.002, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Information maintained by a governmental body described
 by Section 552.003(1)(A)(xii) is public information and subject to
 this chapter only to the extent the information relates to:
 (1)  the receipt or expenditure of public funds or
 other public resources, as described by Section
 552.003(1)(A)(xii)(a);
 (2)  a relationship with one or more governmental
 bodies that involves public funds or other public resources and
 that indicates a common purpose or objective or that creates an
 agency-type relationship, as described by Section
 552.003(1)(A)(xii)(b); or
 (3)  the provision of services that are traditionally
 provided by a governmental body, as described by Section
 552.003(1)(A)(xii)(c).
 SECTION 2.  Section 552.003, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivision (1) and adding Subdivision (5-a) to read as
 follows:
 (1)  "Governmental body":
 (A)  means:
 (i)  a board, commission, department,
 committee, institution, agency, or office that is within or is
 created by the executive or legislative branch of state government
 and that is directed by one or more elected or appointed members;
 (ii)  a county commissioners court in the
 state;
 (iii)  a municipal governing body in the
 state;
 (iv)  a deliberative body that has
 rulemaking or quasi-judicial power and that is classified as a
 department, agency, or political subdivision of a county or
 municipality;
 (v)  a school district board of trustees;
 (vi)  a county board of school trustees;
 (vii)  a county board of education;
 (viii)  the governing board of a special
 district;
 (ix)  the governing body of a nonprofit
 corporation organized under Chapter 67, Water Code, that provides a
 water supply or wastewater service, or both, and is exempt from ad
 valorem taxation under Section 11.30, Tax Code;
 (x)  a local workforce development board
 created under Section 2308.253;
 (xi)  a nonprofit corporation that is
 eligible to receive funds under the federal community services
 block grant program and that is authorized by this state to serve a
 geographic area of the state; and
 (xii)  the part, section, or portion of an
 organization, corporation, commission, committee, institution, or
 agency that:
 (a)  receives or spends public funds or
 other public resources unless the receipt or expenditure of the
 funds or other resources imposes a specific and definite obligation
 on the entity to provide a measurable amount of goods, services, or
 insurance in exchange for the funds or other resources as would be
 expected in an arms-length transaction or quid pro quo agreement
 for goods, services, or insurance between a vendor and purchaser;
 (b)  is involved in a relationship with
 one or more governmental bodies that involves public funds or other
 public resources and that:
 (1)  indicates a common purpose
 or objective; or
 (2)  creates an agency-type
 relationship between the entity and one or more governmental
 bodies; or
 (c)  provides services traditionally
 provided by a governmental body in exchange for [spends or that is
 supported in whole or in part by] public funds or other public
 resources; and
 (B)  does not include the judiciary.
 (5-a)  "Public resources" means in-kind benefits that
 are not generally available to the public.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a request for public information received on or after the
 effective date of this Act.  A request for public information
 received before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect when the request was received, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *