House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 776 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 631 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 537 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 537 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 536 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Watson | Journal Page: 536 |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 536 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 536 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 546 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 484 | |
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 438 | |
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 363 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 341 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 326 | |
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 257 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 01/17/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 39 | |
Senate | 01/05/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/05/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |