E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 4246
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4116
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4116
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5646
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1952
|
Journal Page: 5646
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5646
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3680
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3571
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3571
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5508
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5508
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3221
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3221
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3221
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3221
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3220
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3685
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1333
|
Journal Page: 3684
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3684
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3684
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3654
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Schofield
|
Journal Page: 3653
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3653
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/17/17 5:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 3635
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/17/17 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3479
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3479
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1702
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1181
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1181
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1181
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1181
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1181
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1181
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1181
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 172
|
Senate
|
02/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 172
|
Senate
|
02/01/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 175
|
Senate
|
01/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|