Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB416 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 416


 relating to the composition of the board of directors of the State
 Bar of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 81.020, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b) and (d) and adding Subsection (e) to read
 as follows:
 (b)  The board is composed of:
 (1)  the officers of the state bar;
 (2)  the president, president-elect, and immediate
 past president of the Texas Young Lawyers Association;
 (3)  not more than 30 members of the state bar elected
 by the membership from their district as determined by the board;
 (4)  six persons appointed by the supreme court and
 confirmed by the senate who are not attorneys and who do not have,
 other than as consumers, a financial interest in the practice of
 law; and
 (5)  four at-large [minority member] directors
 appointed by the president as provided by Subsections [Subsection]
 (d) and (e).
 (d)  The president of the state bar appoints the at-large
 [minority member] directors, subject to confirmation by the board
 of directors. In making appointments under this subsection, the
 president shall [attempt to] appoint directors who demonstrate
 knowledge gained from experience in the legal profession and
 community necessary to ensure the board represents the interests of
 attorneys from the varied backgrounds that compose the membership
 of the state bar [members of the different minority groups listed in
 Section 81.002(7)].
 (e)  At-large [Minority member] directors serve three-year
 terms. To be eligible for appointment as an at-large [a minority
 member] director, at the time of appointment a person may [must:
 [(1)  be a minority member of the bar;
 [(2)]  not be serving as:
 (1)  an elected director [at the time of appointment];
 or
 (2)  an at-large [and
 [(3)  not be serving as a minority member] director [at
 the time of appointment].
 SECTION 2.  Section 81.002(7), Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  Notwithstanding Section 81.020, Government
 Code, as amended by this Act, a minority member serving on the board
 of directors of the State Bar of Texas on the effective date of this
 Act continues to serve the term to which the director was appointed.
 On expiration of the director's term, the president of the State Bar
 of Texas shall appoint an at-large director as required by Section
 81.020, Government Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 416 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1;
 May 25, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2017, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 416 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 18, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 142,
 Nays 4, two present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 27, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 113, Nays 32, four present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor