Senate | 04/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 437 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 363 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 172 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 172 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 175 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 99 | |
Senate | 01/17/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 39 | |
Senate | 01/06/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/06/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |