E | 05/27/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/27/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4076 | |
E | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3141 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4566 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2605 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 4365 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2880 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2542 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 2542 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Read | Journal Page: 2542 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2533 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2076 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Record vote | RV#1302 | Journal Page: 3623 |
House | 05/17/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3623 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3623 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3574 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Record vote | RV#1287 | Journal Page: 3573 |
House | 05/16/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3573 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3573 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2460 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1109 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Zaffirini | Journal Page: 866 |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 308 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 93 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 93 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |