Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB44 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/16/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 44


 AN ACT
 relating to requirements relating to an application for a place on
 the ballot.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 141.032(c), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  If an application is accompanied by a petition, the
 petition is considered part of the application, and the review
 shall be completed as soon as practicable after the date the
 application is received by the authority. However, the petition is
 not considered part of the application for purposes of determining
 compliance with the requirements applicable to each document, and a
 deficiency in the requirements for one document may not be remedied
 by the contents of the other document. Unless the petition is
 challenged, the authority is only required to review the petition
 for facial compliance with the applicable requirements as to form,
 content, and procedure.
 SECTION 2.  Section 141.034, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  An application for a place on the ballot may not be
 challenged for compliance with the applicable requirements as to
 form, content, and procedure after the day before any ballot to be
 voted early by mail is mailed to an address in the authority's
 jurisdiction [the beginning of early voting by personal appearance]
 for the election for which the application is made.
 (c)  A challenge must state with specificity how the
 application does not comply with the applicable requirements as to
 form, content, and procedure. The authority's review of the
 challenge is limited to the specific items challenged and any
 response filed with the authority by the challenged candidate.
 SECTION 3.  Section 172.021, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (e) and (g) to read as follows:
 (e)  A candidate for an office specified by Section
 172.024(a)(8), (10), or (12), or for justice of the peace in a
 county with a population of more than 1.5 million, who chooses to
 pay the filing fee must also accompany the application with a
 petition for a place on the primary ballot as a candidate for
 judicial office that complies with the requirements prescribed for
 the petition authorized by Subsection (b), except that the minimum
 number of signatures that must appear on the petition required by
 this subsection is 250.  If the candidate chooses to file the
 petition authorized by Subsection (b) in lieu of the filing fee, the
 minimum number of signatures required for that petition is
 increased by 250.  Signatures on a petition filed under this
 subsection or Subsection (b) by a candidate covered by this
 subsection may not be obtained on the grounds of a county courthouse
 or courthouse annex.
 (g)  A candidate for the office of chief justice or justice,
 supreme court, or presiding judge or judge, court of criminal
 appeals, who chooses to pay the filing fee must also accompany the
 application with a petition that complies with the requirements
 prescribed for a petition authorized by Subsection (b), except that
 the minimum number of signatures that must appear on the petition
 required by this subsection is 50 from each court of appeals
 district.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 44 passed the Senate on
 February 28, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and
 that the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 16, 2017, by
 the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 44 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 9, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor