LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB44
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB44
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB44
Compare Versions
SB44 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB44 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB44 Enrolled May 16, 2017
SB44 Comm Sub May 6, 2017
SB44 Engrossed February 28, 2017
SB44 Comm Sub February 21, 2017
SB44 Introduced November 14, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB44 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB44 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB44 Enrolled May 16, 2017
SB44 Comm Sub May 6, 2017
SB44 Engrossed February 28, 2017
SB44 Comm Sub February 21, 2017
SB44 Introduced November 14, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare