Senate | 05/15/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1730 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 183 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 183 | |
Senate | 01/09/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/09/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |