House | 05/16/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3664 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 1573 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1573 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 856 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 856 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 856 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 01/10/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/10/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |