House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 495 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 495 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 495 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 495 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 495 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 495 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 495 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 526 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 01/10/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/10/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |