House | 05/08/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3155 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 2642 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2642 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 959 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 931 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 893 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 01/11/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/11/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |