E
|
06/09/2017
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5860
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#2013
|
Journal Page: 5859
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5859
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6036
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4138
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5585
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5585
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3578
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3578
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3578
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3578
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3574
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2624
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4379
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1606
|
Journal Page: 4378
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4378
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Huberty
|
Journal Page: 4378
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4378
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Huberty
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3452
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1512
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1512
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1512
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1511
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1511
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1511
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Rodrguez
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1507
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1507
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1178
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 955
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 831
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 681
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 629
|
Senate
|
02/06/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 185
|
Senate
|
02/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 185
|
Senate
|
01/12/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|