8 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 5 | | relating to the extraterritorial jurisdiction of certain |
---|
10 | 6 | | municipalities in coastal border counties. |
---|
11 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 42.0235, Local Government Code, is |
---|
13 | 9 | | amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to |
---|
14 | 10 | | read as follows: |
---|
15 | 11 | | (a) Notwithstanding Section 42.021, and except as provided |
---|
16 | 12 | | by Subsection (d), the extraterritorial jurisdiction of a |
---|
17 | 13 | | municipality with a population of more than 175,000 located in a |
---|
18 | 14 | | county that contains an international border and borders the Gulf |
---|
19 | 15 | | of Mexico terminates two miles from the extraterritorial |
---|
20 | 16 | | jurisdiction of a neighboring municipality if extension of the |
---|
21 | 17 | | extraterritorial jurisdiction beyond that limit would: |
---|
22 | 18 | | (1) completely surround the corporate boundaries or |
---|
23 | 19 | | extraterritorial jurisdiction of the neighboring municipality; and |
---|
24 | 20 | | (2) limit the growth of the neighboring municipality |
---|
25 | 21 | | by precluding the expansion of the neighboring municipality's |
---|
26 | 22 | | extraterritorial jurisdiction. |
---|
27 | 23 | | (d) Extraterritorial jurisdiction for a municipality |
---|
28 | 24 | | subject to this section is determined under Section 42.021 if the |
---|
29 | 25 | | governing body of the municipality and the governing body of the |
---|
30 | 26 | | neighboring municipality each adopt, on or after June 1, 2017, |
---|
31 | 27 | | resolutions stating that the determination of extraterritorial |
---|
32 | 28 | | jurisdiction under Section 42.0235(a) is not in the best interest |
---|
33 | 29 | | of the municipality. |
---|
34 | 30 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
| 31 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 32 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 33 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 468 passed the Senate on |
---|
| 34 | + | April 25, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
| 35 | + | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the |
---|
| 36 | + | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 37 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 38 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 39 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 468 passed the House, with |
---|
| 40 | + | amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 146, |
---|
| 41 | + | Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
| 42 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 43 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 44 | + | Approved: |
---|
| 45 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 46 | + | Date |
---|
| 47 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 48 | + | Governor |
---|