House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4521
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1695
|
Journal Page: 4520
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Failed to pass to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4520
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(3)
|
Journal Page: 4520
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4520
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/23/17 10:49 PM
|
Journal Page: 4518
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 4518
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4518
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3155
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 185
|
Senate
|
02/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 185
|
Senate
|
01/12/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|