House | 05/18/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3746 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 3484 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3484 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1422 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 933 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 913 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 913 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 913 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 911 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Lucio | Journal Page: 911 |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 911 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 911 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 910 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 909 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 919 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 187 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 187 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 121 | |
Senate | 01/23/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 84 | |
Senate | 01/13/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/13/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |