Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB490 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 16, 2017

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 29, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill May 27, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2017
Bill March 27, 2017