LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB495
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB495
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB495
Compare Versions
SB495 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB495 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB495 Enrolled May 16, 2017
SB495 Comm Sub May 6, 2017
SB495 Engrossed March 22, 2017
SB495 Comm Sub March 6, 2017
SB495 Introduced January 17, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB495 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB495 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB495 Enrolled May 16, 2017
SB495 Comm Sub May 6, 2017
SB495 Engrossed March 22, 2017
SB495 Comm Sub March 6, 2017
SB495 Introduced January 17, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare