E
|
05/29/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
E
|
05/23/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2881
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4565
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2880
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2247
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1358
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3768
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3768
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1446
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 860
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 188
|
Senate
|
02/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 188
|
Senate
|
01/17/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|