House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3890 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3529 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3154 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1828 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1750 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1750 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1750 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1749 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1749 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1749 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1749 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hughes | Journal Page: 1749 |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1749 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1749 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 94 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 94 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |