House | 03/07/2017 | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics | Journal Page: 582 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 582 | |
House | 02/14/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 308 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 280 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 262 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 262 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 262 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 262 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 262 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 261 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 261 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 236 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 191 | |
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 176 | |
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |