House | 05/19/2017 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 3655 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3655 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3489 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1952 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1915 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1828 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 188 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 188 | |
Senate | 01/17/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/17/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |