House | 05/08/2017 | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2506 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1688 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA5 Huffman | Journal Page: 1529 |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Amendment adopted as amended | FA2 Taylor of Collin | Journal Page: 1528 |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Amendment amended | Journal Page: 1528 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Amendment to amendment offered | FA4 Taylor of Galveston | Journal Page: 1528 |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 1528 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1527 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Postponed | 4/27/17 11:00 AM | Journal Page: 1312 |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 Perry | Journal Page: 1312 |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1311 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1311 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1311 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 01/18/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/18/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |