Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB516 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/18/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R1264 KEL-D
 By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 516


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report concerning faculty productivity at
 general academic teaching institutions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.4033 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.4033.  STUDY AND REPORT REGARDING FACULTY
 PRODUCTIVITY. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Faculty member" means a person who is employed
 full time by a general academic teaching institution as a member of
 the faculty whose primary duties include teaching or research. The
 term does not include:
 (A)  a person employed in the classified personnel
 system of the institution or a person employed in a similar type of
 position if the institution does not have a classified personnel
 system; or
 (B)  a person who holds faculty rank but who
 spends a majority of the person's time for the institution engaged
 in managerial or supervisory activities, including a chancellor,
 vice chancellor, president, vice president, provost, associate or
 assistant provost, dean, or associate or assistant dean.
 (2)  "General academic teaching institution,"
 "governing board," and "university system" have the meanings
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  To ensure the best use of state funds and the delivery of
 high-quality postsecondary education to students in this state,
 each general academic teaching institution shall conduct a study to
 determine whether tenured faculty members are making a significant
 professional contribution to their employing institutions or to the
 academic community. The study must cover the five-year period
 ending August 31, 2017, and include data regarding the number of
 tenured faculty members who during that period did not achieve any
 of the following performance benchmarks:
 (1)  teaching a class at the institution;
 (2)  actively conducting sponsored or
 institution-funded research at the institution;
 (3)  authoring an article that is in the faculty
 member's academic field and published by a major peer-reviewed
 academic journal, as identified for the purpose of the study by the
 Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board under Subsection (c); or
 (4)  making a significant written contribution to a
 published book in the faculty member's academic field.
 (c)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
 identify, with respect to each academic field taught in a general
 academic teaching institution, all major peer-reviewed academic
 journals and shall make that information available on the board's
 Internet website not later than November 1, 2017. A general
 academic teaching institution may recommend one or more journals
 for inclusion in the journals identified by the coordinating board.
 (d)  The governing board of a general academic teaching
 institution may appoint a committee to conduct the study required
 by this section. A university system may conduct the study for one
 or more of the system's component institutions or may direct a
 component institution to conduct the study with respect to that
 institution and to submit its report in a timely manner to the
 university system administration.
 (e)  Each general academic teaching institution or
 university system, as applicable, shall prepare a report based on
 the study required by Subsection (b). The institution or system
 shall submit the report to the coordinating board not later than
 August 1, 2018. The coordinating board may adopt standards
 governing the form and content of the reports. The coordinating
 board shall compile the reports submitted to the board under this
 subsection and, not later than December 1, 2018, shall submit the
 compilation to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker
 of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer of each
 legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over
 higher education.
 (f)  This section expires January 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.