85R1264 KEL-D By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 516 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study and report concerning faculty productivity at general academic teaching institutions. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 51, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 51.4033 to read as follows: Sec. 51.4033. STUDY AND REPORT REGARDING FACULTY PRODUCTIVITY. (a) In this section: (1) "Faculty member" means a person who is employed full time by a general academic teaching institution as a member of the faculty whose primary duties include teaching or research. The term does not include: (A) a person employed in the classified personnel system of the institution or a person employed in a similar type of position if the institution does not have a classified personnel system; or (B) a person who holds faculty rank but who spends a majority of the person's time for the institution engaged in managerial or supervisory activities, including a chancellor, vice chancellor, president, vice president, provost, associate or assistant provost, dean, or associate or assistant dean. (2) "General academic teaching institution," "governing board," and "university system" have the meanings assigned by Section 61.003. (b) To ensure the best use of state funds and the delivery of high-quality postsecondary education to students in this state, each general academic teaching institution shall conduct a study to determine whether tenured faculty members are making a significant professional contribution to their employing institutions or to the academic community. The study must cover the five-year period ending August 31, 2017, and include data regarding the number of tenured faculty members who during that period did not achieve any of the following performance benchmarks: (1) teaching a class at the institution; (2) actively conducting sponsored or institution-funded research at the institution; (3) authoring an article that is in the faculty member's academic field and published by a major peer-reviewed academic journal, as identified for the purpose of the study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board under Subsection (c); or (4) making a significant written contribution to a published book in the faculty member's academic field. (c) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall identify, with respect to each academic field taught in a general academic teaching institution, all major peer-reviewed academic journals and shall make that information available on the board's Internet website not later than November 1, 2017. A general academic teaching institution may recommend one or more journals for inclusion in the journals identified by the coordinating board. (d) The governing board of a general academic teaching institution may appoint a committee to conduct the study required by this section. A university system may conduct the study for one or more of the system's component institutions or may direct a component institution to conduct the study with respect to that institution and to submit its report in a timely manner to the university system administration. (e) Each general academic teaching institution or university system, as applicable, shall prepare a report based on the study required by Subsection (b). The institution or system shall submit the report to the coordinating board not later than August 1, 2018. The coordinating board may adopt standards governing the form and content of the reports. The coordinating board shall compile the reports submitted to the board under this subsection and, not later than December 1, 2018, shall submit the compilation to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education. (f) This section expires January 1, 2019. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017.