House | 05/20/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4004 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1489 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1146 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Statement(s) submitted | Journal Page: 977 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 977 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 977 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Amendment tabled | Journal Page: 977 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA4 Rodrguez | Journal Page: 977 |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 977 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 977 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 968 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 968 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 919 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |