E | 05/29/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4243 | |
E | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3141 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4566 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2605 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2880 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2493 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4200 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Record vote | RV#1554 | Journal Page: 4199 |
House | 05/22/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 4199 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4199 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4108 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4108 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3746 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1974 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1321 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1280 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1280 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1280 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1280 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1279 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1279 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Burton | Journal Page: 1279 |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1279 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1279 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1279 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 190 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 190 | |
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |