E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4142
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1961
|
Journal Page: 5701
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5701
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 2573
|
Journal Page: 5700
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4117
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 911
|
Journal Page: 4117
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3625
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2514
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2514
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4357
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4357
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3889
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3889
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3889
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2077
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3630
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1305
|
Journal Page: 3630
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3630
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Amended
|
3-Leach
|
Journal Page: 3629
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Simmons
|
Journal Page: 3625
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3625
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Simmons
|
Journal Page: 3623
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3623
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3588
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Amended
|
8-Shaheen
|
Journal Page: 3587
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3574
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3155
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1261
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1199
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1199
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1199
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1199
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1199
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1199
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1199
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 833
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 251
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 251
|
Senate
|
01/19/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|